After nine years in post, Director of the Rayne Foundation TIM JOSS is leaving to set up a new arts and social change charity called Aesop.
12th June 2014
Sales, Export and Advertising Manager of Hyperion Records, MIKE SPRING is stepping down after 25 years with the organisation to pursue other projects.
Wasps Artists’ Studios has appointed architect ANDREW BURRELL as the Chair of its Board.
5th June 2014
Director of Public Affairs and Programming DAMIEN WHITMORE has left the Victoria and Albert Museum as part of a senior management restructure. His role will not be replaced.
Advertising agency Dewynters has appointed a new senior management team. Creative Director BOB KING becomes Chief Executive, with FIONA CARPENTER and LISA POPHAM becoming joint Chief Operating Officers, and DIANE WARREN Chief Administrative Officer.
29th May 2014
The New Director of Marketing and Communications at The Lowry, Salford Quays, is RACHEL MILLER. She leaves her current position as Head of Ticketing at QuayTickets.
The Old Vic has announced that Artistic Director KEVIN SPACEY will be succeeded by MATTHEW WARCHUS. Spacey will be stepping down in 2015 after 10 years with the company. Warchus, who is currently an Artistic Associate at the theatre, is best known for directing the RSC's musical Matilda.
JON GILCHRIST is the new Executive Director of The Bush Theatre in London. He steps down as Marketing Director at Salford’s The Lowry. Interim Executive Director SIAN ALEXANDER leaves to return to her career as a freelance arts consultant after two and a half years in post.
DEBORAH PAKKAR-HULL is the new Artistic Director for Theatre Company Blah Blah Blah. Currently working on the York Mystery Plays, she was previously Artistic Director of Birmingham’s The Play House. Founding Director ANTHONY HADDON is leaving to pursue a freelance career.
22nd May 2014
KATE FARMERY is the new Executive Producer for Dartington Hall Trust. She was previously Head of Operations for Manchester City Galleries. She joins the newly appointed Artistic Director BILL GEE in replacing the single role of Director of Arts.